California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1365 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016