|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 2751.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 9. Page 3096.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
July 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1290.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1148.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|