LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB137
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB137
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB137
Compare Versions
SB137 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB137 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB137 Amended September 4, 2015
SB137 Amended August 31, 2015
SB137 Amended July 16, 2015
SB137 Amended July 2, 2015
SB137 Amended June 1, 2015
SB137 Amended April 21, 2015
SB137 Amended March 26, 2015
SB137 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB137 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB137 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB137 Amended September 4, 2015
SB137 Amended August 31, 2015
SB137 Amended July 16, 2015
SB137 Amended July 2, 2015
SB137 Amended June 1, 2015
SB137 Amended April 21, 2015
SB137 Amended March 26, 2015
SB137 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare