|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 891, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 5598.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6525.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 30). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
August 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Assembly Rule 78 and 63 suspended. From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 11. Page 5977.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4009.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3521.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|