California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 29, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016