|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 847, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 5555.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6369.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4055.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4009.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3617.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19 in T. & H. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|