California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016