California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1383 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2016

Amended

Bill August 31, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016