LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1383
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1383
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1383
Compare Versions
SB1383 Chaptered September 19, 2016
SB1383 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB1383 Amended August 31, 2016
SB1383 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1383 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1383 Amended April 12, 2016
SB1383 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1383 Chaptered September 19, 2016
SB1383 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB1383 Amended August 31, 2016
SB1383 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1383 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1383 Amended April 12, 2016
SB1383 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare