|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 487, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5490.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6228.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4056.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4009.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3646.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on INS. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|