California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016