California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 31, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016