LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1393
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1393
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1393
Compare Versions
SB1393 Chaptered September 26, 2016
SB1393 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB1393 Amended August 31, 2016
SB1393 Amended April 12, 2016
SB1393 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1393 Chaptered September 26, 2016
SB1393 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB1393 Amended August 31, 2016
SB1393 Amended April 12, 2016
SB1393 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare