07/16/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/16/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/08/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2257.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 632.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 7). | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 12/02/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | ||
Senate | 12/01/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |