LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB14
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB14
Compare Versions
SB14 Chaptered July 16, 2015
SB14 Enrolled July 7, 2015
SB14 Amended April 14, 2015
SB14 Amended March 16, 2015
SB14 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB14 Chaptered July 16, 2015
SB14 Enrolled July 7, 2015
SB14 Amended April 14, 2015
SB14 Amended March 16, 2015
SB14 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare