California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill June 23, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016