LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1406
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1406
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1406
Compare Versions
SB1406 Chaptered September 30, 2016
SB1406 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB1406 Amended June 23, 2016
SB1406 Amended May 10, 2016
SB1406 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1406 Chaptered September 30, 2016
SB1406 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB1406 Amended June 23, 2016
SB1406 Amended May 10, 2016
SB1406 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare