|
05/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3975.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4946.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. Joint Rule 61(b) suspended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4886.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 4886.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3871.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3725.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|