California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1408 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 27, 2016

Amended

Bill May 26, 2016
Bill May 23, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016