Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on unfinished business, reconsideration pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 29. Noes 33. Page 6379.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Mullin.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5971.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 4099.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4011.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3644.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3393.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|