California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1441 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 3, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016