|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2780.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 2787.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3181.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 11). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly rule 77.2. Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2690.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1100.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 817.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 757.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|