LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB145
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB145
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB145
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 27, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 16, 2015
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 9, 2015
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 10, 2015
Compare
Bill
August 31, 2015
Compare
Bill
May 5, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 23, 2015
Compare