|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5365.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5887.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 3808.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3560.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|