California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1451 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016