|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5411.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6089.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4060.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4011.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
May 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
May 9 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3645.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|