LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1456
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1456
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1456
Compare Versions
SB1456 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB1456 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1456 Amended August 18, 2016
SB1456 Amended April 27, 2016
SB1456 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1456 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB1456 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1456 Amended August 18, 2016
SB1456 Amended April 27, 2016
SB1456 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare