California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1458 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill June 29, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016