LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1458
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1458
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1458
Compare Versions
SB1458 Chaptered September 30, 2016
SB1458 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1458 Amended June 29, 2016
SB1458 Amended June 23, 2016
SB1458 Amended April 6, 2016
SB1458 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1458 Chaptered September 30, 2016
SB1458 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1458 Amended June 29, 2016
SB1458 Amended June 23, 2016
SB1458 Amended April 6, 2016
SB1458 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare