|
07/16/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1790.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2178.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
June 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 533.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 506.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|