California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB146 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2015

Amended

Bill June 18, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015