|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 597, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5826.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2016
|
June 6 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3709.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3609.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|