California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1476 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016