Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Beall.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
May 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 919.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 824.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|