California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB16 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Amended

Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 13, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015
Bill March 2, 2015