California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill June 22, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015