LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB162
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB162
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB162
Compare Versions
SB162 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB162 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB162 Amended June 22, 2015
SB162 Amended May 5, 2015
SB162 Introduced February 3, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB162 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB162 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB162 Amended June 22, 2015
SB162 Amended May 5, 2015
SB162 Introduced February 3, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare