Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
June 14 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P., & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) . Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1293.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1148.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 723.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|