LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB163
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB163
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB163
Compare Versions
SB163 Amended August 18, 2016
SB163 Amended June 8, 2016
SB163 Amended September 3, 2015
SB163 Amended June 2, 2015
SB163 Introduced February 4, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB163 Amended August 18, 2016
SB163 Amended June 8, 2016
SB163 Amended September 3, 2015
SB163 Amended June 2, 2015
SB163 Introduced February 4, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare