|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2495.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2844.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1330.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1148.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 594.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|