LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB170
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB170
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB170
Compare Versions
SB170 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB170 Amended September 1, 2015
SB170 Amended June 29, 2015
SB170 Amended June 2, 2015
SB170 Amended April 22, 2015
SB170 Amended April 7, 2015
SB170 Amended March 11, 2015
SB170 Introduced February 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB170 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB170 Amended September 1, 2015
SB170 Amended June 29, 2015
SB170 Amended June 2, 2015
SB170 Amended April 22, 2015
SB170 Amended April 7, 2015
SB170 Amended March 11, 2015
SB170 Introduced February 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare