Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cooper.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Reconsideration granted. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 2572.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Lackey.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 838.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 594.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|