LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB175
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB175
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB175
Compare Versions
SB175 Amended August 17, 2015
SB175 Amended June 18, 2015
SB175 Amended April 21, 2015
SB175 Amended March 23, 2015
SB175 Introduced February 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB175 Amended August 17, 2015
SB175 Amended June 18, 2015
SB175 Amended April 21, 2015
SB175 Amended March 23, 2015
SB175 Introduced February 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare