|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 306, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5365.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6019.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 883.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|