California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB187 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill April 21, 2015