California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB196 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill June 15, 2015
Bill May 19, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015