LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB196
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB196
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB196
Compare Versions
SB196 Chaptered September 9, 2015
SB196 Enrolled August 27, 2015
SB196 Amended August 17, 2015
SB196 Amended June 25, 2015
SB196 Amended June 15, 2015
SB196 Amended May 19, 2015
SB196 Amended April 23, 2015
SB196 Amended March 19, 2015
SB196 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB196 Chaptered September 9, 2015
SB196 Enrolled August 27, 2015
SB196 Amended August 17, 2015
SB196 Amended June 25, 2015
SB196 Amended June 15, 2015
SB196 Amended May 19, 2015
SB196 Amended April 23, 2015
SB196 Amended March 19, 2015
SB196 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare