|
10/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 573, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2495.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2858.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 743.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 406.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|