California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB204 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 14, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 24, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015