|
04/18/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 3350.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 4039.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1121.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1101.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
May 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 406.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|